Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1686 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15092 Week
» 68108 Month
» 187635 Year
» 3214488 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
780 |
m/e |
07/1925 |
British Railways |
30780 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 780, name: SIR PERSANT Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30780 |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
27/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
27/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
15/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
11/07/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30780 |
|
|
09/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|