Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 1830 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15236 Week
» 68252 Month
» 187779 Year
» 3214632 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
785 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
British Railways |
30785 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
TOSTORE |
71A |
Eastleigh |
5w/e |
08/10/1951 |
REINS |
71A |
Eastleigh |
w/e |
06/12/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/10/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
25/02/1954 |
Brighton Works |
New construction includes Main Line Diesel-Electric 10203 (approaching completion), 80079 (due 12/2), 80080 (due 2/3), 80081 (due 17/3), 80082 (due 1/4). Terrier 32661 has been re-painted, also- 30922, 30545. Other repairs include 30929, 30785, 32133, 32506, 30732, 30285, 15202, 15231, 10000 (nearly ready to leave), 32670, 42104, 30053, 30044. Nos. 76005/6 have been performing indifferently from Brighton on the heavy 8.20 a.m. up and 3.52 p.m. down via Eridge. It had been hoped that these engines might be the answer to the problem of the through Uckfield to London services, but their performances so far has been in no way superior to that of the Class 4 tanks. |
SLS/195404 |
09/08/1958 |
Urie \"N15\" Class |
The only engine of the class to have a large type Maunsell chimney was No. E742, this being replaced in 1925 by a King Arthur chimney. No. E743 was one of the first to receive the latter type mentioned. A larger variety of stove-pipe chimney with louvres was fitted to No. E755 in 1925. Tender numbering was commenced in 1927. Under the auspices of British Railways, numbers 747/50 figured in the initial B.R. regional prefix scheme whereby they became Nos. S747 and S750 in January, 1948. M.B. It will be observed from the illustration on page 244, that No. 30740 had acquired a six-wheel tender for the purpose of the 'staged' derailment. The large eight-wheel outside frames bogie tenders originally supplied to the class were removed upon withdrawal of the engines and have since replaced older and six-wheel tenders on other engines. A few of the engines which have received these tenders of late are: Nos. 30450/3/4/5/88, 30505/6/10, 30785/95, an 30802. |
SLS/195810 |
28/10/1959 |
Eastleigh MPD (on shed out of use) |
On shed ex-Works:- 30519/692; on shed out of use:- 30117, 30287/9/300/782/5, 31735, 32101/510/76, 32677. |
SLS/195912 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 785, name: SIR MADOR DE LA PORTE Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30785 |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
17/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30785 |
|
|
11/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|