Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1108 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 8568 Week
» 6081 Month
» 233965 Year
» 1455530 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1408 m/e 09/1933
BR 31408 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 09/1933
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/06/1966
Scrapping During 09/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 32 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1933
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948
74A Ashford 4w/e 05/02/1951
73C Hither Green 5w/e 14/02/1953
73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 01/10/1953
73A Stewarts Lane 9w/e 08/02/1955
73F Ashford 6w/e 14/06/1959
72B Salisbury m/e 09/11/1961
70C Guildford 4w/e 16/09/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 05/06/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 74A Ashford 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 8w/e 03/03/1953
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 01/10/1953
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 8w/e 08/02/1955
WDN   m/e 31/03/1958
ALLOC 73F Ashford P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 4w/e 09/11/1961
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 16/09/1963
WDN   w/e 05/06/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/03/1951 Ashford Works (On shed) In shops: 1107, 31245 (late s1245), s1274, 31287, 31329, 31413, 31510, 31812/26/62, 31900/23/25, 32372 (new cyls.), 32502 (lined black), s2473 (being renumbered), 32467, 32525/65, 78597, 90226, 33039. In yard: s1178, 1335, 31789 (green), 31897, 33025, 31616, 31848. On shed for works 1174, 31408, 31461, 32486 (and 30793 for ELH). Scrap: 1157, 31160 (partly cut up), 1547, 1730, 31743, 31502, 32402, and being cut up 1443 an 32301. Building Shunting diesel-electric 15228-30 and a main-line diesel 10203. Twenty sets of frames for 4-6-2 to be built at Crewe, also many sets of all-welded side tanks for new B.R. standard 2-6-4T to be built at Brighton. Noted not renumbered: 1041, 1271, 1339, 1379. Ex shops 32523 (1 dome), 31405, 31785 (green), 31521, and lined black 31401 an 31825 (late s1825) SLS/195108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1933 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1408
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31408    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
08/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
09/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
05/06/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 31408    

prev prev