Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2255 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20058 Week
» 73074 Month
» 192601 Year
» 3219454 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1684 |
m/e |
06/1900 |
British Railways |
31684 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
C |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During 06/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 21/10/1961 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1684 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31684 |
|
|
24/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) |
|
|
05/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
22/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J) |
|
|
10/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31684 |
|
|