Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 328 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18131 Week
» 71147 Month
» 190674 Year
» 3217527 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1783 |
m/e |
04/1926 |
British Railways |
31783 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1947 |
Ashford Works |
No. 1783 has been equipped with a short circuiting bar for use during emergency on third rail. This is housed in a box attached to the back of the tender; the tender number is on the box. Conversion of 1831 to oil burning is going ahead fairly rapidly. The tender is completed and engine about half-ready. |
SLS/194709 |
03/01/1950 |
Ashford Works |
Locomotives in Works on 3/1 included Nos. 1266/67/93, 1309/24, 1553, 31610. 1623/72, 31729, 1783/93, 31806, 1807, 31831/63, 1864. Locomotives ex Works (late December-early January) painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 31145, 31811/38, 32465. 32585. 'D.3' No. 32380 is expected to appear in lined black, as also have Nos. 32388/93 recently, so it would appear that complete extinction of this class is not at present contemplated. |
SLS/195002 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1926 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1783 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31783 |
|
|
21/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
09/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J) |
|
|
08/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
02/12/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31783 |
|
|
02/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|