Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1411 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14817 Week
» 67833 Month
» 187360 Year
» 3214213 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1814 |
m/e |
11/1920 |
British Railways |
31814 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Mongolipers |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 11/1920 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 26/07/1964 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 8 mths , 25 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/05/1951 |
Ashford Works |
In shops: 31225/70/91/335/542/620/34/81/8/763, 31814/34/67/9,5/6, 33008/19, 90142. To be cut up: 31697, (3)1093, (3)1379, 31494, 31509, 31731, 31595, 31743, 31710. New: Diesels 15229/30. |
SLS/195107 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1814 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwood Junction (NORW) |
|
|
01/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31814 |
|
|
01/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
16/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
26/07/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31814 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|