Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 428 Today
» 961 Yesterday
» 5385 Week
» 12569 Month
» 320550 Year
» 1204931 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1873 m/e 09/1925
BR 31873 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 09/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sun 23/01/1966
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 40 yrs, 4 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SAL Salisbury 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73B Bricklayers Arms 7w/e 27/06/1951
75A Brighton 5w/e 02/07/1962
75B Redhill m/e 06/01/1964
70C Guildford 4w/e 18/01/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 23/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 25/06/1962
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 29/12/1963
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 18/01/1965
WDN   w/e 23/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1925 To Service To service as SR Number 1873
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31873    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
18/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 31873    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev