Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 574 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18377 Week
» 71393 Month
» 190920 Year
» 3217773 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2259 |
m/e |
03/1882 |
British Railways |
32259 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stroudley |
Class |
D1M |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-2T |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During 03/1882 |
Withdrawal |
During 03/1948 |
Service Life |
66 yrs |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1882 |
ELH |
|
Eastleigh |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
03/1948 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
ELHWorks |
|
P |
01/12/1947 |
WDN |
EBN |
Eastbourne |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1942 |
Sightings |
'D1' tanks 2259 an 2299 were at New Cross recently, the latter being now in its seventieth year (originally 6 Wimbledon). The only 'Remembrance' class not on loan to the G.W.R. is 2333, shed BZ. 4-4-0's 1151 and 1445 are still green with large tender numerals, and the latter replaced a 0-6-2T as one of the East Croydon pilots on 18/12. 4-6-0 498 was recently seen in Temple Meads. There are ten 'King Arthurs' on loan to the L.N.E.R., 739, 740/2/4, 747-751 an 154; they, have been working from Heaton. |
SLS/194302 |
31/05/1947 |
Eastbourne MPD |
The following locos. were stored out in the open at the end of May at Eastbourne (some partly dismantled and others in a poor state): 'B4' 4-4-0 Nos. 2044, 2054, 2062, 2063, 2068; 'Dl' 0-4-2T Nos. 2234, 2259, 2274, 2284, 2358, 2361, 2605 and 2699. The latter has a Drummond chimney. Some of the above have traces of pre-war green paint and large numbers, while No. 2605 (although rusting), in malachite green, still shows the effects of the care bestowed on her while in Scotland during the recent war. |
SLS/194708 |
24/06/1947 |
Eastbourne MPD |
Four 'Dl' class engines were moved from Eastbourne to Eastleigh on 24/6. These four Nos. 2259, 2284, 2361 and 2699 are for use in connection with oil-burning as is 2244 (ELH). |
SLS/194709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1882 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2259 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
03/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2259 |
|
|
04/1948 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 32259 but not taken up |
|
|