Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 235 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5579 Week
» 6469 Month
» 314450 Year
» 1198831 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) C6 m/e 06/1942
BR 33006 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class Q1
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 06/1942
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/01/1966
Scrapping During 08/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 23 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GFD Guildford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
75E Three Bridges 4w/e 14/10/1963
70C Guildford m/e 06/01/1964
70B Feltham 4w/e 22/06/1964
70C Guildford w/e 20/11/1964
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 08/06/1965
70C Guildford 4w/e 22/11/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 09/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FEL Feltham 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 14/10/1963
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 29/12/1963
ALLOC 70B Feltham 8w/e 22/06/1964
ALLOC 70C Guildford 2w/e 20/11/1964
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 06/06/1965
ALLOC 70C Guildford P 22/11/1965
WDN   w/e 09/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1942 To Service To service as SR Number C6
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 33006    
14/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
20/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
08/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
22/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 33006    
08/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev