Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 111 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 111 Week
» 7295 Month
» 315276 Year
» 1199657 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) C7 m/e 07/1942
BR 33007   17/06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class Q1
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 07/1942
Withdrawal w/e Sun 26/01/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 21 yrs, 6 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GFD Guildford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73C Hither Green 5w/e 14/02/1953
70B Feltham 4w/e 26/05/1953
   Withdrawn w/e 26/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FEL Feltham 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 8w/e 03/03/1953
ALLOC 70B Feltham 9w/e 26/05/1953
WDN   w/e 26/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1942 To Service To service as SR Number C7
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD)    
17/06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 33007    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
26/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 33007    
12/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev