Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 37 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 5469 Week
» 17290 Month
» 186062 Year
» 1070443 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C18 m/e 05/1945
BR 35018 m/e 05/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
13/12/1945 BRITISH INDIA LINE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class Merchant Navy
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 05/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/08/1964
Total Mileage 956,544
Service Life 19 yrs, 3 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
9E Nine Elms 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71B Bournemouth 4w/e 24/11/1960
70A Nine Elms 8w/e 17/01/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 09/08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth P 24/11/1960
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 8w/e 17/01/1961
WDN   w/e 09/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1948 Original cab replaced with revised model
02/1956 Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...

Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1945 To Service To service as SR Number 21C18
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
13/12/1945 Naming Named 'BRITISH INDIA LINE'    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E)    
05/1948 Modification Modification: Original cab replaced with revised model    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 35018    
02/1956 Modification Modification: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...    
24/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
17/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
26/11/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 35018    

prev prev