Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 228 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 2567 Week
» 8701 Month
» 236585 Year
» 1458150 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 8149 m/e 08/1942
BR 48149 w/e 04/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number Lot-154
To Service During 08/1942
Withdrawal w/e Sat 14/01/1967
Scrapping During 01/1968 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 24 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1942
31D Grangemouth 01/01/1948
20B Stourton 4w/e 31/12/1950
15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 02/01/1954
15A Wellingborough w/e 26/03/1960
18A Toton w/e 08/07/1961
16C Derby w/e 22/02/1964
16G Westhouses w/e 07/08/1965
8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 24/09/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 14/01/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 15A Wellingborough w/e 05/02/1949
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough w/e 05/03/1949
ALLOC 20B Stourton m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 26/03/1960
ALLOC 18A Toton 5w/e 05/08/1961
ALLOC 16C Derby 5w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 16G Westhouses 4w/e 07/08/1965
ALLOC 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 08/10/1966
WDN   w/e 14/01/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/02/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Roundhouse: M.R.118/58A, Cecil Raikes, Thundersley. Erecting Shop: 13117, 13292, 42078, 42322/35/84, 42400/9, 43295, 44112/76, 44403, 44580, 47250/89, 47461/99, 47543/65, 47631, 48149, 48355/67, 48678, 75019/46/8. New Paint Shop: D154/5, M.R.1000. Outside New Paint Shop: L.N.W.R, 2650. Diesel Finishing Shop: D72/9, D111/56/7. New Erecting Shop: D158-67. Works Sidings: D10/84, D128, D5142, ED1, 12000, 42306/30, 43679, 44165, 44241, 47003, 47516, 47678, 58214, 75035. Gasworks Siding: Nil. Diesel Test House: D5016. Outside Diesel Test House: D123, D2198, D2221. Diesel Shunter Test House: Nil. Diesel Repair Shop: D2, D122, D2213/20, D2395, D2904, D5018/9/75/7, 11155. Works Shunter: 47325. Shed road: 41168, 42328/63/8/95, 42404/48, 47218. E SLS/196203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1942 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8149
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-154
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Grangemouth (31D)    
04/06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48149    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stourton (20B)    
02/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
08/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
22/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (16C)    
07/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (16G)    
24/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G)    
14/01/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 48149    

prev prev