Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 324 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 324 Week
» 7508 Month
» 315489 Year
» 1199870 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 8153 m/e 09/1942
BR 48153 w/e 29/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number Lot-154
To Service During 09/1942
Withdrawal w/e Sat 16/03/1968
Scrapping During 09/1968 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 25 yrs, 6 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
31E Dawsholm 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
2E Saltley w/e 17/09/1966
8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 04/02/1967
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 24/06/1967
8C Speke Junction w/e 09/12/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 16/03/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 31E Dawsholm w/e 08/11/1947
LOAN 17A Derby w/e 10/04/1948
ALLOC 2E Saltley 4w/e 08/10/1966
ALLOC 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 01/02/1967
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 08/07/1967
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction w/e 30/12/1967
WDN 8C Speke Junction w/e 16/03/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1942 To Service To service as LMS Number 8153
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-154
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dawsholm (31E)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 48153    
17/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (2E)    
04/02/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (8G)    
24/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
09/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
03/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 48153    
09/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev