|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/05/1962 | Derby Works (Stone Pit) | Diesel Erecting Shop: ED3, D63, D70, D84, D105, D168, D3117, D5028/88. Test House: D166/7, 13306, Midland Pullman coaches Nos. u60091/2, u60732/42. Shunter test house: D3067. New Building: D171-D180. Finishing Shop: D81, D169/170, 10203. Erecting Shop: D2504/8, D3019/68, D3368, 13051, 13120, 42071, 42178, 43949, 44210/33/44, 44571, 47004, 47228, 48098, 48386, 53808, 73053, 73140/58. Paint Shop: MR1000, 48687 (15D). 'Stone Pit': 48183, 73039. 'Foundry Row': 41168, 42099, 42352, 43263, 43410/35, 47340/66. 'Bone Yard': 42332. 'Klondyke Sidings': ED1, 12000, 42069, 42283, 43985, 44154, 44561, 44583, 48381. Shop Road: 44049/92, 48261/72, 68030. Works Shunt: D2377, D3168. EXPLANATORY NOTES-Stone Pit: Track adjoining Diesel Finishing Shop. Foundry Row: Name explains itself. Bone Yard: Dump opposite station adjoining main Works Offices. Klondyke: Works arrival sidings between new Paint Shop and Test House. |
SLS/196206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1942 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8183 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24754 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Motherwell (28A) | ||
28/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Derby (17A) | ||
01/05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48183 | ||
08/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) | ||
16/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) | ||
11/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) | ||
02/01/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (18A) | ||
18/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltley (21A) | ||
13/10/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kettering (15B) | ||
29/02/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) | ||
26/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) | ||
31/07/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48183 | ||
11/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |