Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 6 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5350 Week
» 6240 Month
» 314221 Year
» 1198602 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 8194 m/e 06/1942
BR 48194 w/e 11/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 24771
To Service During 06/1942
Withdrawal w/e Sat 19/08/1967
Scrapping During 12/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 25 yrs, 2 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
18A Toton 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
17B Burton w/e 21/04/1962
16E Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 18/06/1966
5B Crewe South w/e 17/09/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 19/08/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 17B Burton 5w/e 05/05/1962
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 09/07/1966
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 4w/e 08/10/1966
WDN   w/e 19/08/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1942 To Service To service as LMS Number 8194
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24771
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Toton (18A)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 48194    
21/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (17B)    
18/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
17/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
08/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 48194    
12/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev