Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1465 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 25096 Week
» 90050 Month
» 292714 Year
» 3319567 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8195 |
m/e |
06/1942 |
British Railways |
48195 |
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Works Number |
24772 |
To Service |
During 06/1942 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 16/04/1966 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
ALLOC |
18B |
Westhouses |
4w/e |
30/06/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
16/04/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1942 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8195 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24772 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Staveley (Barrow Hill) (18D) |
|
|
25/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48195 |
|
|
30/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westhouses (18B) |
|
|
16/04/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48195 |
|
|
07/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|