|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
13/03/1961 | Derby Works (Erecting Shop) | Diesel Erecting Shop: ED2, D3, D232, D2501/8, D2909/10, D3052, D3126, D3778, D8006, 10203, 11116, 12077, 13119. Test House: ED4, D16, D79, D213/21, D5092, 12000. New Building: D9, D25-D33. Finishing Shop: D23/4, D5090, D5133, 10202. Erecting Shop: 42067, 42500/27, 44376, 47202/97, 47313, 47415/30, 47577, 47612/40, 48000/24/81, 48133, 48216, 48607/17/44, 48728, 53806, 75033/9/50/9, 92129. Paint Shop: D22, M1000, 42221, 42317, 43885, 44542, 48351. In Works Sidings: D210, D3172, D5065/72, 40695, 41536, 42134, 42300/67, 42414, 43306, 43574, 44480, 47204, 47312/8/47/72, 47408/39, 47507, 48063, 48121/43, 48153, 48219, 48690, 58850. Ex Works Shed: 10000, 42211, 42391, 42508, 44085, 44264, 44581, 47416, 48701, 75016. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1942 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8216 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24804 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) | ||
26/11/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48216 | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltley (21A) | ||
24/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (18A) | ||
16/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) | ||
05/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Canklow (19C) | ||
20/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) | ||
05/03/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B) | ||
13/05/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Canklow (41D) | ||
08/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) | ||
19/01/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48216 | ||
05/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |