Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2920 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16326 Week
» 69342 Month
» 188869 Year
» 3215722 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
70394 |
m/e |
09/1941 |
British Railways |
48256 |
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Works Number |
24702 |
To Service |
During 09/1941 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/04/1967 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys |
Information |
WD 394 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1941 |
21B |
|
Bescot |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
5D |
|
Stoke |
w/e |
12/03/1966 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
29/04/1967 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
STOCK |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
ALLOC |
21B |
Bescot |
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
5w/e |
12/03/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
29/04/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1948 |
Crewe Works |
New construction for the past month produced only three Caprotti 4-6-0's: No. 44756 (No. 9 of Order E468) completed on 10/5, and No. 44741 and 44742 (Nos. 4 & 5 of Order E.469) completed on 18/5 and 28/5 respectively. Condemned engines cut-up during the past month were dealt with a follows: W/E 8/5 Nos. 7821, 9250; W/E 15/5 Nos. 7769, 9038; W/E 22/5 Nos. 6673, 6738, 9013; W/E 29/5 Nos. 6740, 6920, 25373 an 28484. A number of War Department 2-8-0's of the standard L.M.S. '8F' type have recently returned from the Middle East, and are at present stored in the old carriage works. They are Nos. 70300/01/11/14/18/32/63/94/95/98, 70401/2/3/13/38/43/46/49, 70504/18/76/77/79/82/88 an 70611. Several of these engines are fitted with steam turbo-generators mounted on the right-hand side of the firebox, but no electric lights are in evidence, although conduit piping still exists along the boilers of a few engines. Eight locomotives were recently painted in the new experimental liveries of the British Railways Six Class '7P' 4-6-2's Nos. 46224/27/30/1/2/41 were painted blue (the shade approaching that of Oxford blue), and lined in accordance gwith ex L.N.W.R. practice, whilst two Class '6P' 4-6-0's Nos. 45540 an 46139 were painted green (a shade closely resembling the standard L.N.E.R. green) and also lined in the ex L.N.W.R. style. All eight engines had their buffers, cylinder covers, motion, etc., scoured bright |
SLS/194807 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1941 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 70394 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24702 |
|
|
22/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48256 |
|
|
10/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (21B) |
|
|
12/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
29/04/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48256 |
|
|
11/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|