|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
06/04/1962 | Derby Works (Erecting Shop) | Diesel Erecting Shop: D1, D3, D72, D90, D105, D2506, D2912, D3124, D3859, D5020/2/30/76/86/9/91/2. Test House: D162, D2908, D5029/88, D5136, 10203. New Building: D167-D176. Finishing Shop: D69, D74, D165/6, D5028, D5133. Erecting Shop: D3067/8, D3371, D3585/7, 13117/68/78, 42542, 44243, 44425, 47321, 47534, 48272/82, 48413, 48669/87, 53808, 73140, 75016. Paint Shop: D163 Leicestershire and Derbyshire Yeomanry, D164, M.R. 1000, 42350, Outside : 43982. Works Sidings: ED1, ED3, D2508, D5137, 12000, 41168, 42332/63/75, 42448, 43263, 43410/64, 43760, 43825, 43938/85, 44092, 44154, 44561/83, 47218/59, 47310/40, 47601, 48094, 'Spike Island' (Gasworks): Cut up remains of 42387, 44166, 47353 an 47516. | SLS/196205 |
07/05/1962 | Derby MPD | Ex Works on Shed: D2506, D3178, D5082/9, D5137/8, 43865, 43950, 44569, 47485, 47534, 48094, 48282, 48413, 75016. | SLS/196206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1942 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8282 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (16A) | ||
16/10/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48282 | ||
12/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16C) | ||
05/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) | ||
28/12/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mansfield (16C) | ||
09/04/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B) | ||
25/12/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
16/07/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E) | ||
12/11/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Patricroft (9H) | ||
08/06/1968 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48282 | ||
01/1969 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |