|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/04/1963 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D1030-34, D1064-73 (in various stages of construction), D1550 body built (Brush 2750 H.P. D.E.)- New Construction. D210/17, D305/10/16/30/36/43/73, D8003/14/18, 44675/89, 44756, 44810/28, 45410, 45531, 46515/22, 48404/44, 48526, 48680, 70016/23/46, 82042, 92035, 92127/46/52/53 92207/39. Outside Erecting Shop: 45322, 70035, 80136, For Butlin's Camp, Pwllheli 46100, For Butlin's Camp, Skegness 46203. Yard: 42182, 42426/69, 42592, 44877, 45067, 45126, 45481, 46106/08/23/27, 47380, 82036, 92104/201. Paint Shop and Outside: D1062/3, D57, D214, 44710, 44869, 45002/26/33/42, 45481, 46486, 48660, 92044/97/155 78002. Scrap Road: 46124/34/35. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1944 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8526 Built at Doncaster Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Lostock Hall (24C) | ||
26/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Accrington (24A) | ||
25/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
04/03/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48526 | ||
11/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bletchley (2B) | ||
01/12/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
29/12/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) | ||
04/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rugby (2A) | ||
23/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) | ||
07/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rugby (2A) | ||
29/05/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
02/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (2C) | ||
16/07/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stoke (5D) | ||
09/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48526 | ||
12/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |