|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/03/1961 | Horwich Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Yard: D3925, 40146, 42723/79, 42890, 43880, 44126, 44455, 44512/44, 48118/64, 48507, 48608, 48742/56, 51229, 51441/96, 52270, 52415. Scrap Yard: 50746, 52201/44, 52355. Erecting Shop: D3932-6, D4011/2, 12004/5/46, 42822/4/67/70, 42959/69/75/84, 43000/19, 44099, 44113/97, 44446, 44595, 48056, 48113, 48332, 48454, 48513, 48640/76, 48708, 76077/83, Car Shop: uM28306/81M, uM28586M. Paint Shop: 13247, uM28330M, and the usual preserved engines; Works Shunters: 11304/5/24/68, 47402, 51429. | SLS/196105 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1943 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8640 Built at Brighton Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Derby (17A) | ||
18/09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48640 | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (18A) | ||
17/07/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (18D) | ||
09/08/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (18A) | ||
07/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) | ||
14/03/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northwich (8E) | ||
13/05/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48640 | ||
11/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |