Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 297 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 2636 Week
» 8770 Month
» 236654 Year
» 1458219 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 3127 m/e 10/1945
LNER (1947) 3527 m/e 02/1947
LMS 8732 m/e 10/1947
BR 48732 w/e 02/09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Darlington Works
Works Number 1969
To Service During 10/1945
Withdrawal Tue 26/10/1965
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 20 yrs , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1945
25A Wakefield 01/01/1948
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 30/11/1950
87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 31/12/1950
87F Llanelly 4w/e 05/09/1959
87A Neath (Court Sart) 5w/e 24/08/1964
87F Llanelly w/e 08/11/1964
   Withdrawn 26/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25A Wakefield w/e 18/10/1947
ALLOC 26B Agecroft w/e 15/10/1949
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 05/09/1959
WDN   3w/e 04/05/1964
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 3w/e 10/08/1964
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 3w/e 02/11/1964
TOSTORE   4w/e 13/06/1965
ALLOC 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 3w/e 09/10/1965
WDN   7w/e 07/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
23/07/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D110-2, 42121, 42235, 42579, 42658/9/77, 44987, 45224, 45415/35, 45588, 49395. Outside Paint Shop: D108/13-5, 45658. Works Sidings: 40580, 42377, 42481, 42507, 42602, 44148/75, 44728/66/79, 44824, 44929/49, 45005, 45247, 45445, 45516/44, 45610/30, 46110/35, 47277, 48154, 49049, 90194, 90323, 90621, 92096. Erecting Shop: D116-21, D269, 41229/68, 42158, 42218, 42562/89, 42610, 44374, 44658/85/6, 44821/71/88, 45045/75, 45104/85/99, 45218/48/54/96, 45333/45/73, 45529/89, 45611/8/9/61/72, 46102/31/55, 46243, 46441, 48287, 48393, 48446, 48697, 48732/61/7, 90264, 90327/81, 90646/58, 92030/2/72/7. Outside Erecting Shop: 42086, 42234, 42652, 44687, 45189, 45410, 46142. New Erecting Shop: D76, D122-8, D331, D5142. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5078. Scrap Yard: 43268, 43962, 47418, 58305 intact, 41529 just cut up. Works Shunters: 12071, 42984, 43957, 47618, 51412/44/6, 52093, 52312, 52441/59. SLS/196109
08/04/1962 Crewe South MPD (Ex Works) Waiting Works on 5B: 12009/19, 42677/8, 43681, 44364, 45418, 46144/9, 46205/7/10, 47213, 47547, 48964, 49158, 70016. Ex Works on 5B: 45116, 45225, 46117, 48732. SLS/196205
26/04/1964 Swindon Works (Works Yard) Works Yard: D3508, D3811, 1024, 1447, 1666, 2818, 3721, 4652, 4923, 6106, 6147, 6871, 6915, 6952, 7812, 8102, 8732, 8738, 9425, 9431, 9484, 9486, 9743, 9752, 42961, 42978, 42983, 43001, 43115, 43132, 73003, 73021. A Shop: D812, D831, D846, D1004, D1005, D1013, D1027, D1035, D1041, D848, D1043, D1058, D1065, D1067, D3421, D3808, D3816, D3823, D3828, D3831, D7026, D7029, D7064, D7071, D7080, D9500, D9501, D9502, D9503, D9504, D9505, D9506, D9057 motors mounted, D9508, D9509, D9510, D9511 frames only, 4144, 7019, 7915, 8486, 42954, 42958, 43002, 43044, 43056, 43075, 43090, 43109, 73053, 73066, 76077, 76081, 92225. C Shop: 6025. Dump: 1650, 4706, 5057, 6010, 6603, 6680, 6824, 9420, 9603, 47623. SLS/196406
20/09/1964 Swindon Works (Outside in works yard) On the occasion of the Society farewell to the last G.W.R. County class tour, the following were on works:- Erecting Shop: D602, D806/19/37/43/9, D1001/6/9/14/15/28/32/43/58, D6335/57, D7009/73, 2210, 6862, 6951, 7803, 7924, 43001/137, 73034 an 92223. New Construction: D9512 complete and painted, D9513-6 almost complete, D9517-24 under construction. Top end of shop, PWM653, D3026/32/190/807/14/24. Weighing shed: D850, D1049, Outside in works yard: 4659, 8405/9, 8732, 9425/27, 42954/78, 43115/20, 60941/45, D1016/24, D6352, D7048, N.C.B. 0-6-2T (ex T.V.R.) and King 6000 (for movement to Stratford). Scrap yard: 2818, 5698, 6010, 6824/7/73, 7929, 8418, 9484, 60809/12/33/6/87, 60916/22/5/32/64/75, 43012/112. Stock shed: D3352, D6826, D9510/11. SLS/196410

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1945 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3127
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1969
   
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3527    
10/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 8732    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A)    
02/09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 48732    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
24/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
08/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
07/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 48732    

prev prev