Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1474 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19277 Week
» 72293 Month
» 191820 Year
» 3218673 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
1308 |
m/e |
11/1902 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1902 |
OSY |
|
Oswestry |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/05/1948 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
OSW |
|
m/e |
31/05/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/05/1947 |
Oswestry MPD |
0-6-0's Nos. 844, 849, 855, 884 and 887 were on the shed on 18/5; of these No. 849 had been repainted and was just ex. Stafford Road Works, but it was understood that No. 898 was due for withdrawal. 2-4-0T. No. 1308 was in the shed whilst No. 1196 was on the 'dead' road. 0-6-0ST. No. 680 was in the shops and No. 1331 was in the shed. |
SLS/194708 |
25/03/1948 |
Oswestry |
On 25/3, No. 1197 was shunting in the carriage sidings, while No. 1308 was seen shunting on the Llangynog branch. |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 1308 Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oswestry (OSY) |
|
|
17/05/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1308 |
|
|