Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1225 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14631 Week
» 67647 Month
» 187174 Year
» 3214027 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3213 |
y/e |
1890 |
British Railways |
43213 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During y/e 1890 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 19/05/1962 |
Service Life |
72 yrs, 5 mths , 19 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1890 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3213 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gloucester Barnwood (22B) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43213 |
|
|
25/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10D) |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
19/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43213 |
|
|
05/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|