Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 440 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18243 Week
» 71259 Month
» 190786 Year
» 3217639 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3335 |
m/e |
05/1892 |
British Railways |
43335 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Kitson |
To Service |
During 05/1892 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 22/08/1959 |
Service Life |
67 yrs, 3 mths , 23 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/01/1946 |
Belle Vue MPD |
The following interesting visitors were noted during January: 2829 (21A); 3319 (16B); 3982 (15A); 3615 (4A); 4853 (20A), 5298 (8A); 12861 (23B). During February: 3231 (20G); 3335 (20G); 3454 (15D); 3620 (21A); 3859 (16B); 4045 (22B); 4186 (21A); 4292 (11E). On 9/2 6132 (20A) passed through on an express travelling in the direction of Manchester Victoria. |
SLS/194604 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1892 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3335 Built at Kitson |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hellifield (20G) |
|
|
20/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43335 |
|
|
22/08/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43335 |
|
|
08/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|