Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 823 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14229 Week
» 67245 Month
» 186772 Year
» 3213625 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3583 |
m/e |
10/1899 |
British Railways |
43583 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Kitson |
To Service |
During 10/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 04/08/1962 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 10 mths , 5 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1899 |
21B |
|
Bournville |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
21A |
|
Saltley |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
21B |
Bournville |
w/e |
26/10/1946 |
ALLOC |
21A |
Saltley |
4w/e |
30/01/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1899 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3583 Built at Kitson |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bournville (21B) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43583 |
|
|
09/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
04/08/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43583 |
|
|
05/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|