03/08/1947 |
Evercreech Junction |
The following branch line workings were noted during a visit on 3/8:-Evercreech-Burnham Nos. 1298, 1346, 3218, 3356, and 3464 Bridgwater: No. 3593. |
SLS/194709 |
16/10/1961 |
Derby Works (In Works Sidings) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D6, D211, D312, D2908/9/13, D5084/9, 10203, 11146. Diesel Test House: D3, D138/9, D226, 11145, 12100. Shunter Test House: 12096. New Building: D142-D151. Finishing Shop: D76, D140/1, D5024, D8000. Erecting Shop: D3578, 12078, 13122/3, 42198, 42368, 42421, 44172/8, 44213/94, 44436, 47250, 47350/88/99, 48001/53/7, 48356, 48439, 58850 frames only, 73073, 73137/59, 75015/30/5. Paint Shop: 42408, 44185, 48491, 73010. In Works Sidings: ED3, D1, D10, D43, D75, D89, D2501, D5143, 10202, 12000/54, 41168, 41804, 42328, 42404, 42510/21/4, 43295, 43593, 43905, 44033, 44232/48, 47218/68/98, 47529, 47666, 48009/10, 48185, 48380, 73158, 75017, 92059. |
SLS/196111 |
05/11/1961 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Works Sidings: 12000, 42332, 42404, 43368, 43826, 43905/75, 44033, 44581, 47268, 47529, 47666, Cecil Raikes. Gasworks Siding: 44263, 47472. Erecting Shop: D3015/22, 12054/68/84, 12100, 13123, 41804, 42421, 42503, 43593, 43620, 44130, 44241, 44401, 44560, 47298, 47521, 48009, 48110/85/92, 48304/80, 48467, 58850, 73073, 73156/8, 75030/52. Diesel Finishing Shop: D89, D140/2/3, D8017/37. Diesel Test House: D141, D211/26. Outside Diesel Test House: D43, D80, D2501. New Erecting Shop: D144-54. Diesel Shunter Test House: 13122. Paint Shop: M.R.1000. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Diesel Repair Shop: D2908/9, D5024, D5143, 10202/3, 11145. Outside Diesel Repair Shop: D2504, 11118. Shed Road: 41168, 42328, 42510/21/4, 43295. |
SLS/196112 |
17/11/1961 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D44, D80, D2504, D2908/9/13, D8017/37, 10202, 11118/45. Former Paint Shop: D3122/3, D5143, 10203, 12100. Diesel Test House: D142/3. Shunter Test House: 12054. New Building: D141, D147-D156. Finishing Shop: D85, D144-D146. Erecting Shop: D3015/22, 12068/82/4, 42369, 42503, 43593, 43620, 43940/75, 44118, 44263, 44332, 44560, 47391/9, 47460/72, 47656, 48033, 48170/92, 48304, 48552, 58218, 58850 heavy repairs nearly completed, 73136/56. Paint Shop: D140, M.R. 1000 sheeted, 48110. In Works Sidings: ED3, 12000, 41168, 42328/95, 42404, 42510/21/4/34, 43295, 43368, 43826/32, 43905, 44033, 44581, 47218/73, 47865/83, 47529/43, 48005, 73044, 73133/42/58. |
SLS/196112 |
16/06/1963 |
Derby Works (Stored outside offices) |
Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 41531 cut up, 41535, 73001/32, 75012, D147, D2396, D2507, D2911, D3017/21/3/56/68, D3305, ED6/7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay-D3, D46, D62, D5008, D5133/48; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay-D5215-21, D7568-73. Finishing Shop: D81, D116/9, D5010. Paint Shop: 75064, D5213/4. Diesel Erecting Shop: D34, D52, D75, D97, D112, D134/5, D141, D160, D5024/82. Test House: D109, D5012/4/32/86, D5138, D5213. Yard (by paint shop): 42178, D2, D4, D6, D7, D42/3, D72, D98, D114, D131, D149, D154, D3122, D5002/9/13, D5142, D5206/10/1, ED4. Stone Pit: 63578, D2503. Foundry Row: 41537, 42472, 42500, 43599, 44417, 47341, 47429, 47465, 73007, 75011/50, D90. Stored outside offices: 43593, 43645, 43754, 47417, 10000/201/2/3. |
SLS/196307 |