Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3186 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16592 Week
» 69608 Month
» 189135 Year
» 3215988 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3607 |
y/e |
1899 |
British Railways |
43607 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During y/e 1899 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 09/06/1956 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 6 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1956 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
y/e |
1899 |
19A |
|
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
09/06/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
16/06/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
25/03/1950 |
Devons Road MPD |
In the Works' roads were: Nos. 40532 (ex Works), 43607, 44370, also Nos. 41939/51 (lined out and ? stored), 41928/29/41/45/66/68/76/77 an 2097. The crane tank-No. 58865-was in the shed and four 0-6-OT's were in evidence: Nos. M27510, 58853/58/61. |
SLS/195005 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1899 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3607 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43607 |
|
|
1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
09/06/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43607 |
|
|