Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1405 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19208 Week
» 72224 Month
» 191751 Year
» 3218604 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3612 |
y/e |
1899 |
British Railways |
43612 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During y/e 1899 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 10/01/1959 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 1 mth , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
y/e |
1899 |
19E |
|
Belle Vue |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
39A |
|
Gorton |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/01/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
91E |
To Eastern Region |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
LOAN |
39A |
Gorton |
4w/e |
28/04/1956 |
ALLOC |
91E |
To Eastern Region |
w/e |
16/06/1956 |
LOAN |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
01/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
23/02/1958 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
27/12/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1899 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3612 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Belle Vue (19E) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43612 |
|
|
21/04/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
10/01/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43612 |
|
|
02/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|