Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4360 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17766 Week
» 70782 Month
» 190309 Year
» 3217162 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3751 |
m/e |
05/1902 |
British Railways |
43751 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During 05/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 21/08/1961 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 3 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1902 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3751 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Staveley (Barrow Hill) (18D) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43751 |
|
|
28/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
30/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B) |
|
|
21/08/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43751 |
|
|
09/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|