Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 627 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14670 Week
» 79624 Month
» 282288 Year
» 3309141 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Pre Grouping |
45 |
m/e |
08/1915 |
Great Western Railway |
1372 |
y/e |
1923 |
Great Western Railway (2nd) |
431 |
on |
21/07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Dunbar |
Class |
45 |
Company History |
BMJR/GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
To Service |
During 08/1915 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 05/10/1953 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1915 |
NPT |
|
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
05/10/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/10/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1915 |
To Service |
To service as BMR Number 45 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
|
|
1923 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1372 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
21/07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 431 |
|
|
05/10/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 431 |
|
|