Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3053 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16459 Week
» 69475 Month
» 189002 Year
» 3215855 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Pre Grouping |
46 |
m/e |
09/1915 |
Great Western Railway |
1373 |
y/e |
1923 |
Great Western Railway (2nd) |
432 |
on |
19/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Dunbar |
Class |
45 |
Company History |
BMJR/GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
To Service |
During 09/1915 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 26/05/1953 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 8 mths , 25 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1915 |
NPT |
|
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
26/05/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/05/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1915 |
To Service |
To service as BMR Number 46 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
|
|
1923 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1373 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
19/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 432 |
|
|
26/05/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 432 |
|
|