Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 467 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18270 Week
» 71286 Month
» 190813 Year
» 3217666 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Pre Grouping |
47 |
m/e |
09/1915 |
Great Western Railway |
1374 |
y/e |
1923 |
Great Western Railway (2nd) |
433 |
m/e |
31/05/1947 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Dunbar |
Class |
45 |
Company History |
BMJR/GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
To Service |
During 09/1915 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 08/02/1951 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 5 mths , 8 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1915 |
RYR |
|
Radyr |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
CHYS |
|
Cardiff Cathays |
4w/e |
07/08/1948 |
RYR |
|
Radyr |
4w/e |
31/12/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/02/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1915 |
To Service |
To service as BMR Number 47 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
|
|
1923 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1374 |
|
|
31/05/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 433 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Radyr (RYR) |
|
|
07/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (CHYS) |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (RYR) |
|
|
08/02/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 433 |
|
|