Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 786 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14192 Week
» 67208 Month
» 186735 Year
» 3213588 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
68 |
m/e |
09/1918 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Hurry Riches |
Class |
A1 |
Company History |
RR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
To Service |
During 09/1918 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 29/06/1954 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 9 mths , 29 dys |
Total Mileage |
552,550 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1918 |
CED |
|
Cardiff East Dock |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/06/1954 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/06/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1918 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 68 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff East Dock (CED) |
|
|
29/06/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68 |
|
|
11/09/1954 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|