Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 807 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18610 Week
» 71626 Month
» 191153 Year
» 3218006 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
83 |
m/e |
08/1909 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Hurry Riches |
Class |
P |
Company History |
RR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
To Service |
During 08/1909 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 09/05/1955 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 9 mths , 8 dys |
Total Mileage |
615,716 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 83 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cae Harris (Dowlais) (CH) |
|
|
20/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
15/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
09/05/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 83 |
|
|
18/06/1955 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|