Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 157 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17960 Week
» 70976 Month
» 190503 Year
» 3217356 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway (Taff Vale) |
141 |
m/e |
12/1884 |
Great Western Railway (1st) |
792 |
y/e |
1923 |
Great Western Railway (2nd) |
193 |
m/e |
30/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Hurry Riches |
Class |
H |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Kitson |
To Service |
During 12/1884 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 25/02/1952 |
Service Life |
67 yrs, 2 mths , 26 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1884 |
THT |
|
Treherbert |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
25/02/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
29/02/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1884 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 141 Built at Kitson |
|
|
1923 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 792 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Treherbert (THT) |
|
|
30/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 193 |
|
|
25/02/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 193 |
|
|