Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 761 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3447 Week
» 4337 Month
» 312318 Year
» 1196699 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 1606   03/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 16xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Thu 03/11/1949 to Danygraig (DG)
Withdrawal During 09/1961
Scrapping During 03/1962 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 11 yrs, 9 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DG Danygraig (New) 03/11/1949
87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 30/09/1950
87H Neyland 4w/e 30/11/1950
87F Llanelly m/e 16/06/1956
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 30/11/1949
1STALLOC DG Danygraig m/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 09/09/1950
ALLOC 87H Neyland 4w/e 04/11/1950
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 19/05/1956
WDN   m/e 30/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/11/1949 To Service To service as GWR Number 1606
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Danygraig (DG)
   
30/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Neyland (87H)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 1606    
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Triangle. SLS 1/1962 Link
03/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev