Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4197 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17603 Week
» 70619 Month
» 190146 Year
» 3216999 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
1613 |
on |
02/12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
16xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
381 |
To Service |
Fri 02/12/1949 to Carmarthen (CARM) |
Withdrawal |
Fri 19/03/1965 |
Service Life |
15 yrs, 3 mths , 17 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
CARM |
Carmarthen |
m/e |
31/12/1949 |
ALLOC |
87F |
Llanelli |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
ALLOC |
87F |
Llanelli |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
87F |
Llanelli |
4w/e |
26/12/1953 |
ALLOC |
87F |
Llanelli |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
ALLOC |
87H |
Neyland |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
5w/e |
31/08/1963 |
ALLOC |
86C |
Hereford |
4w/e |
31/12/1963 |
ALLOC |
88B |
Radyr |
3w/e |
02/11/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
5w/e |
12/04/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/12/1962 |
Cardiff East Dock MPD |
There is no diesel locomotive whatever here and CED is now a full main line shed for the first time in its life ! This must be unique in railway history and the steam phase is expected to last two years as Canton is being demolished completely to make way for a diesel shed and main diesel depot for S. Wales. On 9th December, 1962, the following were on shed-1613, 2875/97, 3662, 3782/4, 3804/10, 4090, 4242/72/82, 5043/74/81/97, 5220/4/5/9, 5749, 6606/37/81, 6813/32/75/6, 6918/32/45/56/72/7/87/95, 7016, 7913, 8425/97, 9426/37, 9629, 92003/236/44/6. |
SLS/196302 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/12/1949 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 1613 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Carmarthen (CARM) |
|
|
05/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
31/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neyland (87H) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hereford (86C) |
|
|
08/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
19/03/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1613 |
|
|
07/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|