Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3540 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16946 Week
» 69962 Month
» 189489 Year
» 3216342 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
1618 |
on |
19/12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
16xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
381 |
To Service |
Mon 19/12/1949 to Llanelli (LLY) |
Withdrawal |
Mon 21/05/1962 |
Service Life |
12 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/06/1958 |
Burry Port MPD |
On 30th June, the allocation was 1607/9/14/5/8/51/66. |
SLS/195808 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/12/1949 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 1618 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Llanelli (LLY) |
|
|
28/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LDR) |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
31/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
01/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (84K) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J) |
|
|
21/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1618 |
|
|
02/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|