Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 5 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5349 Week
» 6239 Month
» 314220 Year
» 1198601 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 1626   10/08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 16xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Tue 10/08/1950 to St Blazey (83E)
Withdrawal During 08/1962
Scrapping During 08/1963 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 11 yrs, 11 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
83E St Blazey (New) 10/08/1950
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1961
83E St Blazey (Reinstated) m/e 10/1961
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 02/12/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 83E St Blazey 4w/e 12/08/1950
NEW NYA   m/e 31/08/1950
WDN   m/e 30/09/1961
REINS 83E St Blazey m/e 31/10/1961
ALLOC 83E St Blazey 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 02/12/1961
WDN   m/e 31/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/08/1950 To Service To service as GWR Number 1626
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to St Blazey (83E)
   
10/1961 Reinstated Reinstated to St Blazey (83E)    
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 1626    
08/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev