Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 345 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18148 Week
» 71164 Month
» 190691 Year
» 3217544 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
1653 |
on |
21/12/1954 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
31/12/1954 |
ALLOC |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
4w/e |
01/01/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/12/1954 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 1653 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
05/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1653 |
|
|
06/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|