Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1529 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19332 Week
» 72348 Month
» 191875 Year
» 3218728 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
1669 |
on |
26/05/1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/05/1955 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 1669 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
01/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (84K) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
13/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neyland (87H) |
|
|
24/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G) |
|
|
17/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
24/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
01/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1669 |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|