Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 165 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17968 Week
» 70984 Month
» 190511 Year
» 3217364 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
409 |
m/e |
03/1867 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Armstrong |
Class |
Standard Goods |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
10thGoods |
Works Number |
100 |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram S3 (Round top firebox) | Train Brakes | Vacuum |
|
To Service |
During 03/1867 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1919 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
FDL |
Ferndale |
4w/e |
01/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
THT |
Treherbert |
m/e |
31/03/1948 |
ALLOC |
FDL |
Ferndale |
4w/e |
18/06/1949 |
ALLOC |
THT |
Treherbert |
4w/e |
13/08/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1883 |
Diagram W3 boiler fitted (Round firebox) |
08/1907 |
Diagram S2 boiler fitted (Round top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1867 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 409 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 100 |
|
|
12/1883 |
Modification |
Diagram W3 boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1907 |
Modification |
Diagram S2 boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1919 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 409 |
|
|
31/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Treherbert (THT) |
|
|
18/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ferndale (CV.FDL) |
|
|
13/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Treherbert (THT) |
|
|