|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/11/1959 | Brecon demotion | Brecon's allocation was divided from 2nd November, 1959-2219/36, 3638, 3706/47/67, 7794 to Newport (86A) and 46506/16/8/9/20/1/2 to Oswestry (89A) thus making the shed an overnight stabling depot. | SLS/196002 |
31/07/1962 | Withdrawn GWR engines | It is understood that the following have been withdrawn and are lying at their home sheds mainly: 1004/26, 1462, 2200/29/56/71/94, 3211, 3623/30/88/94, 3741/50/83, 4037/99, 4102/6/16/8/29/52, 4236/91, 4557/67, 4906/9/13/7/21/34/7/41/4/7/8/52/60/7/9/84/99, 5007/8/11/6/7/9/21/30/2/3/4/6/45/6/7/52/61/4/6/8/75/88/94, 5190, 5357/99, 5520/5/44/50/4/62, 5617/31/46/98, 5746, 5910/1/7/8/26/30/1/40/59/64/6/73/80/1/2/99, 6001/2/7/9/12/4/5/6/9/21/2/6/7, 6146, 6330/42/62/6/88/91, 6617/30/40/1/7, 7300/1/5/11/6/21/31/6/41, 8449, 9785, 42385, 90355/6/565/693. LTE has 7749 on loan pending permanent transfer. | SLS/196210 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/06/1938 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 2200 Built at Swindon Works |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Machynlleth (MCH) | ||
30/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Didcot (81E) | ||
18/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J) | ||
16/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C) | ||
13/08/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J) | ||
08/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Westbury (82D) | ||
17/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2200 | ||
06/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |