Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 28 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17831 Week
» 70847 Month
» 190374 Year
» 3217227 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2223 |
on |
29/08/1940 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
2251 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
337 |
To Service |
Fri 29/08/1940 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 11/05/1962 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 8 mths , 12 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1947 |
General |
The latest batch of 41XX 2-6-2T have been noted in many places. No. 4148 was seen working local trains between Newport and Cardiff and on station pilot duties at Newport. No. 4157 passed through Cheltenham en route to Tyseley and has since worked stopping trains to Leamington. No. 4159 , also allocated to the Wolverhampton Division (CHR) went via Oxford and was noted there on 12/9. Nos. 4156/8 have joined the 2-6-2T allocated to Severn Tunnel Junction for assisting trains through the tunnel. Recent observations in West Wales found Nos. 3654 an 4654 at Milford Haven, the former on the passenger turn to Johnstone. Nos. 7816, 3447 an 4358, were impressively clean at Neyland. Carmarthen produced a number of the smaller types of loco. Nos. 7407 an 2236 on local goods, 2223 on the 6.15 p.m. departure for Aberystwyth and L.M.S. Nos. 6620 an 6740 on the branch trains to Llandovery. No. 5819, once a regular at Newcastle Emlyn was awaiting repair outside the factory. |
SLS/194710 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/08/1940 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2223 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Machynlleth (MCH) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fishguard Goodwick (87J) |
|
|
05/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
11/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2223 |
|
|
12/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|