Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 168 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1267 Week
» 7401 Month
» 235285 Year
» 1456850 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 2250 on 14/09/1945

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 2251
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 347
To Service Tue 14/09/1945
Withdrawal During 08/1962
Scrapping During 09/1963 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 16 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 14/09/1945
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 01/11/1952
82C Swindon 4w/e 31/10/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 31/10/1959
WDN   m/e 31/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/09/1945 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 2250
Built at Swindon Works
   
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 2250    

prev prev