|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering Works during May included: 111, 1336, 1716, 1796, 2046, 2061, 2266, 2458, 2651, 2777, 2780, 2827, 2834, 2870, 2924, 2987, 3032, 3044, 3046, 3341, 3364, 3382, 3625, 3711, 3837, 3855, 4079, 4083, 4086, 4297, 4706, 4901, 4921, 4943, 4974, 4976, 4994, 4996, 5005, 5007,, 5029, 5044, 5050, 5092, 5322, 5326, 5392, 5937, 5963, 6117, 6342, 6383, 6906, 6929, 6955, 6964, 6969, 7210 and 9755. | SLS/194708 |
30/09/1947 | Worcester MPD | Three of Worcester's older engines have returned from works recently newly painted; they are Nos. 2051, 2458 an 3574. | SLS/194711 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1895 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 2458 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1460 |
||
11/1911 | Modification | Modification: B4 boiler fitted | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Worcester (WOS) | ||
30/01/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brecon (89B) | ||
11/05/1954 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2458 | ||
19/06/1954 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |