Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 35 Online
» 2368 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15774 Week
» 68790 Month
» 188317 Year
» 3215170 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2667 |
|
09/1902 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
Aberdare |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
135 |
Works Number |
1955 |
To Service |
During 09/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 27/10/1949 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 1 mth , 26 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1910 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
12/1918 |
Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2667 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1955 |
|
|
10/1910 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1918 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Canton (CDF) |
|
|
14/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (PPRD) |
|
|
27/10/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2667 |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|