Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4297 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17703 Week
» 70719 Month
» 190246 Year
» 3217099 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2768 |
|
09/1900 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
2721 |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
122 |
Works Number |
1783 |
To Service |
During 09/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 23/10/1947 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 1 mth , 22 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1900 |
SBZ |
|
St Blazey |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
23/10/1947 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
SDN |
Swindon |
4w/e |
12/07/1947 |
WDN |
SBZ |
St Blazey |
m/e |
31/10/1947 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1903 |
S2 boiler fitted |
06/1907 |
S4 boiler fitted |
08/1912 |
B4 boiler fitted |
03/1920 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1947 |
Swindon Works |
Locos. entering Works during September included: Nos. 1005, 1925, 1935, 2112, 2148, 2195, 2444, 2551, 2612, 3005, 3017, 3022, 3023, 5318, 5319, 5335, 5398, W.D. 77368, 78543 an 79274. Works' pilots recently have been: Nos. 200, 2723, 2731, 2733 an 2768. No. 5049 CDF (ex Works 23/9) has been fitted with an experimental Swindon design mechanical lubricator (similar to that fitted to No. 4905) and also a 4-row superheater. The present batch of new 'Hall' Class locos. which are of the modified or '6959' Class are being fitted with straight sided tenders; No. 6974 and onwards are being lined out. |
SLS/194711 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2768 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1783 |
|
|
09/1903 |
Modification |
Modification: S2 boiler fitted |
|
|
06/1907 |
Modification |
Modification: S4 boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1912 |
Modification |
Modification: B4 boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1920 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Blazey (SBZ) |
|
|
23/10/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2768 |
|
|