28/02/1946 |
Swindon Works |
Locos entering works during February: 1499, 1967, 2034/60, 2211/59, 2573, 2753/79, 2803/17/9/41/58/79/96, 2944, 3013/23/30, 3186, 3216, 3737/64, 3865, 4030/49/52/6/73/83/92, 4117, 4231, 4531, 4607/19/38, 4833/56, 4926, 5002/24/42/53/68/77/8, 5151, 4320/36/78 5412/21, 5506/43/68, 5689, 5737, 5912/7/71/83, 6002/18/27, 6105/47/68, 6300/84/7, 6717/37, 6806/66, 6932/8/46, 8719/34/69, 9306, 9768/89/91. Nameplates were affixed to 6938/46. |
SLS/194605 |
24/03/1946 |
Stock Returns |
No. 92 which has been shown as withdrawn, was transferred to Wellingon in October 1938 and is still there. On 2/3 it appeared to be 100 per cent. intact but for the coupling rods. Assuming that the date of its withdrawal from service coincided with its conversion to a stationary boiler, the official date of 8/42 must be questioned for it has been functioning as such at least since the summer of 1941. No: 92 is not the only locomotive to be so employed, for 1287, which was withdrawn on 9/9/39 and subsequently reinstated, is at Leamington. However although employed for the ,same purpose as 92, and in the same condition, it still remains on the capital list. Mr. Seddon would be grateful for any information as to when 1287 first appeared at Leamington, for how long she was at work as a motive unit and also as to the last time that 92 was actively engaged at Wellington. Regarding the latter this will be co-related with the first appearance there of L.M.S. saddle tank 16027, which is permanently on loan from 4A. 3573/80 shown in the stock returns as 2-4-0T should be entered as 0-4-2T and the relevant totals altered accordingly. |
SLS/194605 |
28/02/1946 |
Swindon Works |
Locos entering works during February: 1499, 1967, 2034/60, 2211/59, 2573, 2753/79, 2803/17/9/41/58/79/96, 2944, 3013/23/30, 3186, 3216, 3737/64, 3865, 4030/49/52/6/73/83/92, 4117, 4231, 4531, 4607/19/38, 4833/56, 4926, 5002/24/42/53/68/77/8, 5151, 4320/36/78 5412/21, 5506/43/68, 5689, 5737, 5912/7/71/83, 6002/18/27, 6105/47/68, 6300/84/7, 6717/37, 6806/66, 6932/8/46, 8719/34/69, 9306, 9768/89/91. Nameplates were affixed to 6938/46. |
SLS/194605 |
31/07/1947 |
Swindon Works |
Locos. entering Works during July included:-Nos. 1019, 2532, 2841, 2852, 2931, 2936, 2939, 2943, 3831, 3862, 4032, 4074, 4083, 5005, 5030, 5357, 5936, 5942, 5990, 6317, 6345, 6360, 6395, W.D. 77294, 78542 and 78632. No. 2651 WOS was ex Works on 5/7. New engines reported seen are:-Nos. 4155 BRD, 4156 STJ and 6753-55 CV.BRY. - The following have received 'TF' boilers: Nos. 1410, 3790, 4630, 6405, 8756, and 9707. 'Austerity' Nos. 77000, 77443, 78510, 78512, 78521, and 79235 are all ex repairs in Belgium and painted black. The new 67XX are the same as the earlier ones, in that they are not fitted with screw couplings, train heating, vacuum brake or A.T.C. equipment. They are, however, fitted with 'TF' boilers. |
SLS/194709 |
14/10/1962 |
Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works |
1628/60, 2841/62, 3217, 3608/58, 3709/15/51/60/78, 4147, 4910/51, 5070, 5245, 5602, 6141, 6644/63/79, 6816, 6982, 7209, 8498, 9411/53, 9608/10/5/40/82. Ex-Works on shed: 9404/15; ex-Works on Oxley MPD; 4697, 7739. 'Kings' at Stafford Road minus numbers and nameplates: 6001/2/7/12/4/5/7/22. |
SLS/196211 |
10/01/1963 |
Birmingham |
One incident during many which occurred during the bad weather was on 10th January, when the 7-35 a.m. Bristol-Bradford arrived in New Street hauled by B1 61337 piloted by 0-6-0PT 9453! They had replaced a diesel failure and were in turn replaced by 73091; however, this developed vacuum trouble and finally the train was cancelled at 1-10 p.m. (it was then over 3 hours late ) and the stock taken to Saltley. On 15th January, the Fawley tank empties were hauled through New St. by GWR 2-8-0 2841 . |
SLS/196302 |